Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1372 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19175 Week
» 72191 Month
» 191718 Year
» 3218571 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3394 |
29/10/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08324 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/10/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3394 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08324 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
23/12/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08324 from March (MR) |
|
|
30/11/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|