Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 658 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14701 Week
» 79655 Month
» 282319 Year
» 3309172 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D34 |
29/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45119 |
31/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
29/06/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
07/05/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
Cut Up |
12/04/1994 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/10/1962 |
Unknown |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D34 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45119 |
|
|
07/05/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45119 |
|
|
12/04/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|