Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3402 |
29/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08332 |
07/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/11/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3402 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Toton (16A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08332 |
|
|
16/09/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08332 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
11/05/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|