Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1139 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18942 Week
» 71958 Month
» 191485 Year
» 3218338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3403 |
29/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08333 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/11/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3403 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Margam (87B) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08333 |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08333 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|