Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 439 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1824 Week
» 8629 Month
» 115575 Year
» 1337140 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3406 19/12/1957
TOPS (Tops) 08336 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/12/1957
Withdrawn 05/04/1981 off York (North) (YK)
Time in Service 23 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1982
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 19/12/1957
88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 27/12/1958
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 27/02/1960
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 13/08/1960
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 22/04/1961
91N To North Eastern Region 9w/e 18/03/1968
51L Thornaby 5w/e 30/03/1968
YK York (North) w/e 09/05/1976
   Withdrawn 05/04/1981


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/12/1957 To Service To service as D3406
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N)    
30/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08336    
09/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
05/04/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 08336 from York (North) (YK)    
01/03/1982 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev