Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 579 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18382 Week
» 71398 Month
» 190925 Year
» 3217778 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3408 |
01/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08338 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/01/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3408 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
15/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (AY) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08338 |
|
|
05/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (WS) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GL) |
|
|
15/07/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08338 from Margam (MG) |
|
|
06/11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Swansea Maliphant |
|
|