Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1528 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15571 Week
» 80525 Month
» 283189 Year
» 3310042 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D341 |
26/04/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40141 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3087/D637 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
26/04/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
09/10/1983 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Bogie fractures |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
26/04/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/05/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
11/05/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
13/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D341 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3087 Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40141 |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
09/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40141 |
|
|
08/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|