Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2598 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16004 Week
» 69020 Month
» 188547 Year
» 3215400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3410 |
16/01/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08340 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3410 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08340 |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08340 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|