Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 399 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1784 Week
» 8589 Month
» 115535 Year
» 1337100 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3419 16/11/1957
TOPS (Tops) 08349 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/11/1957
Withdrawn 31/07/1983 off Cardiff Canton (CF)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 16/11/1957
88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 27/12/1958
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1962
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 29/11/1964
   Withdrawn 31/07/1983


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/11/1957 To Service To service as D3419
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08349    
31/07/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 08349 from Cardiff Canton (CF)    
01/06/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev