Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 233 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 233 Week
» 34808 Month
» 104287 Year
» 1325852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3424 05/02/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08354 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/02/1958
Withdrawn 10/07/1986 off Cardiff Canton (CF)
Time in Service 28 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 17/04/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
88B Cardiff East Dock (New) 05/02/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 27/12/1958
88M Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1962
86A Cardiff Canton w/e 29/11/1964
   Withdrawn 10/07/1986


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/02/1958 To Service To service as D3424
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08354    
10/07/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 08354 from Cardiff Canton (CF)    
17/04/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev