Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 209 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 2769 Week
» 15802 Month
» 238203 Year
» 1122584 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3439 24/09/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 24/09/1957
Withdrawn 01/09/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 24/09/1957
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 06/02/1960
36A Doncaster w/e 27/02/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/03/1963
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 01/01/1966
   Withdrawn 01/09/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
24/09/1957 Power Unit ER69663    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/09/1957 To Service To service as D3439
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
02/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
01/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3439    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co.: Chesterfield    

prev prev