Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3440 27/09/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 27/09/1957
Withdrawn 28/12/1968
Time in Service 11 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 01/05/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 27/09/1957
34E New England w/e 19/12/1959
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 30/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 01/01/1966
   Withdrawn 28/12/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
27/09/1957 Power Unit ER80503    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/09/1957 To Service To service as D3440
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
28/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3440    
01/05/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev