Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3555 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13129 Week
» 78083 Month
» 280747 Year
» 3307600 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3440 |
27/09/1957 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/09/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
27/09/1957 |
Power Unit ER80503 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3440 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3440 |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|