Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 124 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2707 Week
» 19656 Month
» 133917 Year
» 1018298 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3441 01/10/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 01/10/1957
Withdrawn 01/09/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs , 11 mths
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 01/10/1957
34E New England w/e 05/12/1959
30F Parkeston Quay w/e 10/09/1966
30E Colchester w/e 07/01/1967
   Withdrawn 01/09/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
01/10/1957 Power Unit ER69937    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/10/1957 To Service To service as D3441
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
10/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
01/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3441    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev