Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3442 08/10/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 08/10/1957
Withdrawn 29/09/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 08/10/1957
34C Hatfield w/e 14/11/1959
40B Immingham w/e 16/07/1960
40E Colwick w/e 12/11/1960
40F Boston w/e 22/04/1961
40E Colwick w/e 11/01/1964
16A Toton w/e 16/12/1967
   Withdrawn 29/09/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
08/10/1957 Power Unit ER69957    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/10/1957 To Service To service as D3442
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
29/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3442    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev