Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3395 Week
» 16428 Month
» 238829 Year
» 1123210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 488 m/e 03/1885
LSWR (Dup) 0488 m/e 03/1914
SR (1931) 3488 m/e 11/1946
BR 30583 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class Radial Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3209
To Service During 03/1885
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1961
Total Mileage 1,604,703
Service Life 76 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 20/05/1950
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/07/1950
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1885 To Service To service as LSWR Number 488
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 3209
   
03/1914 Renumbered Renumbered to 0488    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3488    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30583    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30583    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: On Works RO 3/1972 Link

prev prev