Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 177 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1085 Week
» 22067 Month
» 164021 Year
» 1048402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3443 10/10/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 10/10/1957
Withdrawn 08/12/1968
Time in Service 11 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 10/10/1957
36A Doncaster w/e 28/11/1959
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 28/09/1963
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
30A Stratford w/e 09/03/1968
   Withdrawn 08/12/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
10/10/1957 Power Unit ER80542    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1957 To Service To service as D3443
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3443    
01/06/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev