Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 102 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 19476 Month
» 214930 Year
» 1099311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3444 17/10/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/10/1957
Withdrawn 29/12/1968
Time in Service 11 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34A Kings Cross (New) 17/10/1957
36A Doncaster w/e 28/11/1959
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 21/11/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
34E New England w/e 06/07/1968
31B March w/e 14/09/1968
   Withdrawn 29/12/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
17/10/1957 Power Unit ER69964    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/10/1957 To Service To service as D3444
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kings Cross (34A)
   
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
21/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
14/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
29/12/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3444    
01/08/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    
01/09/1969 Sightings At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard RO489 11/69 Link

prev prev