Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 177 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1085 Week
» 22067 Month
» 164021 Year
» 1048402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3445 22/10/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 22/10/1957
Withdrawn 07/11/1968
Time in Service 11 yrs , 16 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1969
Cut At Cox and Danks (Park Royal)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 22/10/1957
30A Stratford w/e 06/05/1967
   Withdrawn 07/11/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
22/10/1957 Power Unit ER69922    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1957 To Service To service as D3445
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
06/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/11/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3445    
01/04/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Park Royal    

prev prev