Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 744 Today
» 820 Yesterday
» 4147 Week
» 21096 Month
» 135357 Year
» 1019738 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3447 31/10/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 31/10/1957
Withdrawn 23/03/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 31/10/1957
16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966
   Withdrawn 23/03/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
31/10/1957 Power Unit ER80586    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1957 To Service To service as D3447
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. SLS 1/1962 Link
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
23/03/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3447    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev