Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 102 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 19476 Month
» 214930 Year
» 1099311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3449 08/11/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/11/1957
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 10 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1968
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 08/11/1957
16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
08/11/1957 Power Unit ER69910    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/11/1957 To Service To service as D3449
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D3449    
01/08/1968 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev