Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D345 17/05/1961
TOPS (Tops) 40145 26/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 3091/D641
To Service 17/05/1961
Withdrawn 10/06/1983
Time in Service 22 yrs , 24 dys
Information Derailment damage
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55H Neville Hill (New) 17/05/1961
50A York (North) w/e 12/01/1963
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 28/01/1967
52A Gateshead w/e 11/10/1969
HM Healey Mills w/e 29/02/1976
   Withdrawn 10/06/1983

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/05/1961 To Service To service as D345
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3091
Allocated to Neville Hill (55H)
   
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
09/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40145    
29/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM)    
10/06/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 40145    

prev prev