Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3451 18/11/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/11/1957
Withdrawn 14/07/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 18/11/1957
   Withdrawn 14/07/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
18/11/1957 Power Unit ER80548    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/11/1957 To Service To service as D3451
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
14/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3451    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev