Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3452 22/11/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 22/11/1957
Withdrawn 22/06/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs , 7 mths
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
35A New England (New) 22/11/1957
36A Doncaster w/e 14/07/1962
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 19/12/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
16A Toton w/e 12/11/1966
   Withdrawn 22/06/1968

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
22/11/1957 Power Unit ER80559    

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/11/1957 To Service To service as D3452
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (35A)
   
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
22/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D3452    

prev prev