Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 901 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18704 Week
» 71720 Month
» 191247 Year
» 3218100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3454 |
27/05/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08369 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/05/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
27/05/1957 |
Power Unit IH3854 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3454 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08369 |
|
|
31/03/1985 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
15/06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|