Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2477 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15883 Week
» 68899 Month
» 188426 Year
» 3215279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
505 |
m/e |
10/1920 |
British Railways |
30505 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Urie / R. Maunsell |
Class |
S15 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 10/1920 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1920 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/08/1958 |
Urie \"N15\" Class |
The only engine of the class to have a large type Maunsell chimney was No. E742, this being replaced in 1925 by a King Arthur chimney. No. E743 was one of the first to receive the latter type mentioned. A larger variety of stove-pipe chimney with louvres was fitted to No. E755 in 1925. Tender numbering was commenced in 1927. Under the auspices of British Railways, numbers 747/50 figured in the initial B.R. regional prefix scheme whereby they became Nos. S747 and S750 in January, 1948. M.B. It will be observed from the illustration on page 244, that No. 30740 had acquired a six-wheel tender for the purpose of the 'staged' derailment. The large eight-wheel outside frames bogie tenders originally supplied to the class were removed upon withdrawal of the engines and have since replaced older and six-wheel tenders on other engines. A few of the engines which have received these tenders of late are: Nos. 30450/3/4/5/88, 30505/6/10, 30785/95, an 30802. |
SLS/195810 |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh Works (On Works) |
On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 505 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30505 |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30505 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|