Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 910 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6515 Week
» 18062 Month
» 417744 Year
» 494331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3462 27/06/1957
TOPS (Tops) 08377 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 27/06/1957
Withdrawn 26/06/1983 off Laira (LA)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 27/06/1957
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/05/1962
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 07/12/1968
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/05/1972
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 22/06/1974
BZ St Blazey w/e 22/02/1975
   Withdrawn 26/06/1983

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
27/06/1957 Power Unit IH3863    

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1957 To Service To service as D3462
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
01/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
07/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
13/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08377    
22/06/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
22/02/1975 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (BZ)    
26/06/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 08377 from Laira (LA)    

prev prev