Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C101 m/e 06/1945
BR 34001 7w/e 03/05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/07/1945 EXETER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed06/1945
Rebuilt11/1957
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Nov 1957

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 08/10/1957
73A Stewarts Lane m/e 10/02/1961
70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C101
Built at Brighton Works
   
10/07/1945 Naming Named 'EXETER' by Alderman V Thompson (Mayor) at Exeter Central    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34001    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34001    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev