Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C103 m/e 06/1945
BR 34003 y/e 1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/07/1945 PLYMOUTH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed06/1945
Rebuilt09/1957
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb1957

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 17/06/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 08/10/1957
72B Salisbury m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 20/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   w/e 20/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C103
Built at Brighton Works
   
11/07/1945 Naming Named 'PLYMOUTH' by Alderman H G Mason (Lord Mayor) at Plymouth Friary    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34003    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34003    

prev prev