Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2666 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16072 Week
» 69088 Month
» 188615 Year
» 3215468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C103 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
British Railways |
34003 |
y/e |
1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
11/07/1945 |
PLYMOUTH |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
Company History |
SR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 20/09/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb1957 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
LP Series 1 |
3252 |
06/1945 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3255 |
12/1945 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 1 |
3262 |
01/1946 |
SR |
4,500g |
5t 0cwt |
LP Series 2 |
3325 |
28/09/1957 |
SR |
5,500g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1957 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C103 Built at Brighton Works Tender fitted: LP Series 1 |
|
|
11/07/1945 |
Naming |
Named 'PLYMOUTH' by Alderman H G Mason (Lord Mayor) at Plymouth Friary |
|
|
12/1945 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3255 |
|
|
01/1946 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3262 |
|
|
1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 34003 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
09/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
09/1957 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
28/09/1957 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3325 |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
20/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 34003 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|