Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 1022 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5596 Week
» 33554 Month
» 68196 Year
» 1289761 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C104 m/e 06/1945
BR 34004 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/11/1945 YEOVIL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed06/1945
Rebuilt02/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 24/02/1958
73A Stewarts Lane m/e 10/02/1961
71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C104
Built at Brighton Works
   
02/11/1945 Naming Named 'YEOVIL' by Councillor W S Vosper (Mayor) at Yeovil Town    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34004    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34004    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev