|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 10/03/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Brighton Works | 18/01/1956 | 17/02/1956 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 26/09/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 19/12/1957 | 01/02/1958 | 45 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Bricklayers Arms (on shed) | 10/11/1959 | 16/12/1959 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 04/10/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 13/08/1962 | 17/08/1962 | 5 days | Non Classified | |||
Bricklayers Arms (on shed) | 02/04/1963 | 18/05/1963 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 21/10/1963 | 14/12/1963 | 55 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 08/03/1966 | 01/04/1966 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Brighton Works | Engines built in May were Nos. 34073 an 34074 'Battle of Britain' Class, without names. No. 34004 Yeovil, 34005 Barnstaple and 34006 Bude came out with L.M.S. type tenders, the tenders painted un-lined black, lettered 'British Railways' in white, and the engines in standard green livery. Other engines re-numbered in May were Nos. 32507, 32398, 30900, 32546, 32440, 32506, 32558, 32523, 32395 an 34042 Dorchester. | SLS/194807 |
29/06/1948 | Stirling MPD | 2-6-4T's Nos. 42198/99 arrived here on Tuesday night (29/6), after trials on the former Southern Rly. 'West Country' No. 34004 with black ex L.M.S. tender and lettered BR., was observed here on 3/7 at 5 p.m. on the 9.25 a.m. ex Crewe en route to Perth, being piloted by ex L.M.S. No. 4980. | SLS/194808 |
05/01/1949 | Brighton Works | Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. | SLS/194902 |
01/02/1949 | Brighton Works | Engines in shops:-Nos. 21C101, CC2, 34004/05/20, 34061 73 Squadron, 34062/65, 2039/76/89, 2325, 2489, 2514, 32339, 32520 an 77062/94, for repair. Two 'Leader' Class under construction. No. 34090 left shops on 31/1 named Sir Eustace Missenden, Southern Railway Battle of Britain Class, the S.R. Coat-of-arms is also incorporated in the nameplate, the background of which is painted Air Force blue. The locomotive is painted malachite green with yellow lining, but the wheel centres instead of being black are also green and the tyres yellow. The British Railways crest is on the tender. | SLS/194903 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1945 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C104 Built at Brighton Works |
||
30/06/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3265 | ||
02/11/1945 | Naming | Named 'YEOVIL' by Councillor W S Vosper (Mayor) at Yeovil Town | ||
30/09/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3271 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34004 | ||
24/07/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3300 | ||
03/02/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3305 | ||
10/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. | ||
18/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1956. Dep: 17/02/1956. | ||
26/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956. | ||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
01/02/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3352 | ||
24/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
10/11/1959 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1959. Dep: 16/12/1959. | ||
04/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. | ||
10/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
13/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 13/08/1962. Dep: 17/08/1962. | ||
02/04/1963 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1963. Dep: 18/05/1963. | ||
21/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1963. Dep: 14/12/1963. | ||
10/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) | ||
08/03/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1966. Dep: 01/04/1966. | ||
01/04/1966 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3302 | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34004 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |