Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C105 m/e 07/1945
BR 34005 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
30/08/1946 BARNSTAPLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed07/1945
Rebuilt06/1957
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 07/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/10/1966
Scrapping During 10/1967
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Jun 1957

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 9w/e 12/06/1957
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 14/01/1958
72B Salisbury m/e 10/02/1961
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms q/e 14/01/1958
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C105
Built at Brighton Works
   
30/08/1946 Naming Named 'BARNSTAPLE' by Councillor R Berry (Mayor) at Barnstaple Town    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34005    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
14/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34005    

prev prev