Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C106 m/e 08/1945
BR 34006 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/11/1945 BUDE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 08/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/03/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
70E Salisbury m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 19/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C106
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/11/1945 Naming Named 'BUDE' by Councillor J H Hallett (Chairman Bude & Stratton UDC) at Bude    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34006    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34006    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev