Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C108 m/e 09/1945
BR 34008 m/e 08/04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
31/10/1945 PADSTOW

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed09/1945
Rebuilt07/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/06/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Sep 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
75A Brighton 3w/e 13/10/1958
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 25/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE   5w/e 01/10/1953
REINS 70A Nine Elms 10w/e 10/12/1953
TOSTORE   6w/e 30/12/1953
REINS 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 22/06/1954
TOSTORE 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms w/e 13/06/1955
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 01/11/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
WDN   w/e 25/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C108
Built at Brighton Works
   
31/10/1945 Naming Named 'PADSTOW' by L H L Saunders (Chairman Padstow UDC) at Padstow    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34008    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34008    

prev prev