Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 524 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 21213 Month
» 269506 Year
» 1153887 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C109 m/e 09/1945
BR 34009 m/e 13/04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
27/08/1946 LYME REGIS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed09/1945
Rebuilt01/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 09/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/10/1966
Scrapping During 09/1967
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Jan 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 70A Nine Elms w/e 06/12/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/06/1966
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C109
Built at Brighton Works
   
27/08/1946 Naming Named 'LYME REGIS' by H I Blanchard (Mayor) at Axminster    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34009    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
27/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34009    

prev prev