Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 705 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1652 Week
» 20434 Month
» 268727 Year
» 1153108 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C111 m/e 10/1945
BR 34011 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/06/1947 TAVISTOCK

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1945
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 30/11/1963
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 18 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 11/03/1959
   Withdrawn 4w/e 30/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/03/1948
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 12/01/1959
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C111
Built at Brighton Works
   
13/06/1947 Naming Named 'TAVISTOCK' by J Heyden (Chairman Tavistock UC) at Tavistock    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34011    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 34011    

prev prev