Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 523 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2430 Week
» 21212 Month
» 269505 Year
» 1153886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C112 m/e 10/1945
BR 34012 9w/e 01/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/11/1945 LAUNCESTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed10/1945
Rebuilt01/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/12/1966
Scrapping During 04/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Jan 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950
72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/02/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 24/02/1958
75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962
70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 11/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/03/1948
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 70A Nine Elms w/e 06/12/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 11/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C112
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/11/1945 Naming Named 'LAUNCESTON' by Alderman G E Trood JP (Mayor) at Launceston    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34012    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34012    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev