Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1120 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5694 Week
» 33652 Month
» 68294 Year
» 1289859 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C113 m/e 10/1945
BR 34013 9w/e 01/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/06/1947 OKEHAMPTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed10/1945
Rebuilt10/1957
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Oct 1957

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 08/10/1957
75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962
70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/03/1948
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C113
Built at Brighton Works
   
12/06/1947 Naming Named 'OKEHAMPTON' by W H Passmore (Mayor) at Okehampton    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34013    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34013    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev