Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 717 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 20446 Month
» 268739 Year
» 1153120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C115 m/e 11/1945
BR 34015 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/06/1946 EXMOUTH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 11/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 16/04/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/02/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70E Salisbury m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 16/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 16/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C115
Built at Brighton Works
   
26/06/1946 Naming Named 'EXMOUTH' by Councillor J Down (Mayor) at Exmouth    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34015    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link
04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34015    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev