|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eastleigh Works | 01/07/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 53 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 23/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 22/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 33 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 27/12/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 11/12/1957 | 10/01/1958 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 07/08/1958 | 27/09/1958 | 52 days | General | Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
Eastleigh Works | 09/11/1959 | 28/11/1959 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 28/07/1960 | 06/08/1960 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Bricklayers Arms (on shed) | 10/05/1961 | 29/06/1961 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 08/02/1962 | 17/03/1962 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 16/04/1964 | 06/06/1964 | 52 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 03/11/1964 | 13/11/1964 | 11 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/06/1947 | Brighton Works | 21C118 Axminster was outside Brighton Works on 6/6/47, also a tender painted and lined in grey for one of the 'Pacifics' under construction. Kent and East Sussex Rly. 0-6-0T ('Terrier') No. 3 is undergoing general repairs at Brighton Works. | SLS/194708 |
09/07/1947 | Brighton Works | New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. | SLS/194709 |
30/06/1948 | General | Locomotives with smokebox number plates include: Nos. 30193, 30521/70, 30696, 30856/61, 30950, 32095, 34012/18. | SLS/194808 |
18/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D2250, D6500/3/7, 15212, 30055, 30781, 30864, 33020, 34002/52, Erecting Shop: D3042, D3271, D3471, D5012/4, D6506/63, L.S.W.R. 120, 4694, 9667, 30045, 30515/42, 30838/43, 30955, 31795/8, 32646, 33039, 34011/18/24/66/72, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76005/19/63, 80010/65/6, 80139/41/51, 92239. Scrap Road: 30059, 30475/6, 30905, 31723. | SLS/196204 |
25/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. | SLS/196204 |
31/05/1964 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. | SLS/196407 |
12/08/1967 | Salisbury MPD | On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1945 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 21C118 Built at Brighton Works |
||
17/12/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3262 | ||
17/01/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3255 | ||
25/02/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 1 number 3259 | ||
25/06/1946 | Naming | Named 'AXMINSTER' by H Cawley Chairnian (Axminster UDC) at Axminster | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) | ||
01/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34018 | ||
11/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
13/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. | ||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. | ||
22/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955. | ||
27/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957. | ||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958. | ||
07/08/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: LP Series 2 number 3340 | ||
07/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
||
09/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/11/1959. Dep: 28/11/1959. | ||
28/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1960. Dep: 06/08/1960. | ||
10/05/1961 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1961. Dep: 29/06/1961. | ||
08/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/02/1962. Dep: 17/03/1962. | ||
06/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
16/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/04/1964. Dep: 06/06/1964. | ||
03/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1964. Dep: 13/11/1964. | ||
27/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 34018 | ||
04/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |