Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C120 m/e 12/1945
BR 34020 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
25/06/1946 SEATON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1945
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/05/1962
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RAM Ramsgate m/e 31/03/1946
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 70A Nine Elms w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/05/1962
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C120
Built at Brighton Works
   
25/06/1946 Naming Named 'SEATON' by W J Newton (Chairman Seaton UDC) at Seaton Junction    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34020    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34020    

prev prev