Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C123 m/e 02/1946
BR 34023 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/1947 BLACKMOOR VALE (removed 04/1950)
04/1950 BLACKMORE VALE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 02/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70D Eastleigh m/e 14/09/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 15/05/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 5w/e 04/02/1950
TOSTORE   3w/e 30/11/1950
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 08/10/1951
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 15/05/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C123
Built at Brighton Works
   
08/1947 Naming Named 'BLACKMOOR VALE'    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34023    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
04/1950 Naming Renamed 'BLACKMORE VALE'    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
15/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34023    

prev prev