Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 675 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 9014 Week
» 6122 Month
» 113068 Year
» 1334633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C124 m/e 02/1946
BR 34024 9w/e 01/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/1946 TAMAR VALLEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed02/1946
Rebuilt02/1961
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 02/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb 1961

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70F Bournemouth m/e 11/11/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 2w/e 12/08/1949
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 6w/e 26/09/1949
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 11/11/1963
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C124, name: TAMAR VALLEY
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34024    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
11/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 34024    
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev