Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1007 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7127 Week
» 18698 Month
» 266991 Year
» 1151372 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C126 m/e 04/1946
BR 34026 3w/e 28/05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1946 YES TOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed04/1946
Rebuilt02/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 18/09/1966
Scrapping During 05/1967
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74B Ramsgate 4w/e 24/02/1958
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959
72B Salisbury 4w/e 24/11/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 18/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 26/09/1947
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72B Salisbury P 24/11/1960
WDN   w/e 18/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C126
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34026    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
20/07/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34026    

prev prev