Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C128 m/e 04/1946
BR 34028 8w/e 08/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1946 EDDYSTONE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed04/1946
Rebuilt08/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 31/05/1964
Service Life 18 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 05/02/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
71B Bournemouth w/e 11/03/1959
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 31/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction P 01/12/1947
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth q/e 12/01/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 24/09/1962
WDN   w/e 31/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C128, name: EDDYSTONE
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34028    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34028    

prev prev