Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C129 m/e 05/1946
BR 34029 4w/e 12/03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1946 LUNDY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed05/1946
Rebuilt12/1958
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 13/09/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965
Service Life 18 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Dec 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A Nine Elms w/e 11/03/1959
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 13/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction P 01/12/1947
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction w/e 13/06/1955
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms q/e 12/01/1959
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 13/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C129, name: LUNDY
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34029    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34029    

prev prev