Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C130 m/e 05/1946
BR 34030 8w/e 08/01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/1946 WATERSMEET

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1946
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/10/1948
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C130, name: WATERSMEET
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34030    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 34030    

prev prev