Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 6 Today
» 1367 Yesterday
» 6540 Week
» 6540 Month
» 195675 Year
» 1417240 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C132 m/e 06/1946
BR 34032 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1946 CAMELFORD

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed06/1946
Rebuilt10/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/10/1966
Scrapping During 05/1967
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Oct 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1946
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948
72B Salisbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70E Salisbury m/e 11/11/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 09/10/1950
REINS 72C Yeovil Town 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 11/11/1963
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
31/05/1965 Steam Plentiful at Clapham Junction During 2½ hours at the 'busiest junction (combined) station in the world' then a subsequent 30 mins. or so at Waterloo on an ordinary weekday evening covering the peak period at the end of May, and as then normal-though some of the Pacifics were not exactly as rostered-I noted 10 rebuilt light Pacifics on express and main line trains : Nos. 34008/13/32/47/8/56/77/85/7/101; 34077/87 had no visible name plates when passing through. Several were on 'Merchant Navy' turns including the Bournemouth 2-hr. up service due in at 4.40, about 12 mins. late; and the heavy, fast-timed 6.30 p.m. down. Only two of the large 4-6-2s: 35026/9 were seen respectively hauling the down 'Royal Wessex' and up 'Bournemouth Belle,' loaded to 11 Pullmans plus van, about 3 mins. late, signal-checked through Clapham Junction. Most were in a rather forlorn looking state externally. Of B.R. standard classes there were: 3 class 5, 4-6-0s; a class 4 2-6-0 on down freight towards Feltham; green class 3 2-6-2T No. 82006 (lately arrived from Machynlleth, Cambrian line) on two trips with the unadvertised Kensington Post Office passenger trains; two others, also two class 4 2-6-4Ts, were on Clapham Yard-Waterloo empty stock workings. The sole Southern Railway, Maunsell, engine was S15 4-6-0MT, 30838, waiting at Waterloo in evening. SLS/196507


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1946 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C132, name: CAMELFORD
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
01/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34032    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
02/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34032    

prev prev