Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 5 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 6239 Month
» 314220 Year
» 1198601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C132 m/e 06/1946
BR 34032 9w/e 01/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1946 CAMELFORD

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class West Country/Battle of Britain
Company History SR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Air Smoothed06/1946
Rebuilt10/1960
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 06/1946
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/10/1966
Scrapping During 05/1967
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Oct 1960

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RAM Ramsgate 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70E Salisbury m/e 11/11/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 02/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1948
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 5w/e 09/10/1950
REINS 72C Yeovil Town 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 11/11/1963
WDN   w/e 02/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1946 To Service To service as SR Number 21C132, name: CAMELFORD
Built at Brighton Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 34032    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 34032    
23/10/1966 Sightings Salisbury depot: On shed RO 12/1966 Link

prev prev